Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Acquistion, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rothbard, Todd Bennett, against Daigle, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; First Acquistion, LLC vs. Daigle, L. ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 3 2006 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.