Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rodriguez Ofelia, filed a(n) Civil case against Escarcega Tony Lee, in the jurisdiction of Luna County, NM, . Luna County, NM Superior Courts with Hofacket, Jarod K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLuna County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDv Dismissal By Party |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Order (1 Page) |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS (pgs-2) |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORD: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Second Amended Temporary Restraining Order -08/17/2022 at 2:15 pm (2 Pages) |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED NOT SERVED Unable to Served Respondent (1 Page) |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORD: AMENDED ORDER Amended Temporary Restraining Order - 08/01/2022 at 4:00 pm (2 Pages) ***Correcting Date Issued*** |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORD: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Hearing: 08/01/2022 at 4:00 pm (2 Pages) |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
OPN: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction (10 Pages) |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION SHEET Re: Tony Escarcega (2 Pages) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.