Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chavez Albertico C., filed a(n) Miscellaneous case represented by Crumley Ashlea A., against Hernandez Jesus Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Luna County, NM, . Luna County, NM Superior Courts with DeLaney, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLuna County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecision For The Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO WITHDRAW as counsel for the plaintiff (pg 2) |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORD: WITHDRAWAL/ SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Order Granting Motion to Withdraw (1 page) |
|
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED NOT SERVED (2 pgs) |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Writ of Execution. (3 pgs) |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (2 pages) | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION (NON-OPENING) Application For Writ of Execution (pg 2) |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE Notice Served to K.M. obo the defendant on 11/17/2022 (PG 6) |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE Of Right to Claim Exemptions From Execution (PG 4) |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT Issued (2 Pages) |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: SUMMARY JUDGMENT Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (3 pages) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.