Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mcguinness Jude, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Martinez Orlando C., against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stanley Thomas E, represented by Schwarz Todd A., in the jurisdiction of Bernalillo County, NM, . Bernalillo County, NM Superior Courts with Lopez, Victor S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLopez, Victor S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBernalillo County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION of Jude McGuinness |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION of Thomas E. Stanley |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY C |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand 12 Person/No Fee EF | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Defendants State Farm and Thomas Stanley's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND 12 PERSON | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | OPN: COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.