Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Teresa A Gardner, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Keath L Bills, B Brent Ferguson, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 1984 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 12/19/1984 | |
December 08, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 10/10/1985 | |
December 08, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 10/20/1983 | |
December 08, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 02/14/1985 | |
September 05, 1985 | Docket Event | AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM) WAS FILED BY TERESA A GARDNER ON 09/05/1985 | |
February 06, 1985 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING (MOT TO CONTINUE) WAS FILED BY KEATH L BILLS ON 02/06/1985 | |
February 29, 1984 | Docket Event | MOTION - OTHER (MOT TO ADVANCE) WAS FILED BY TERESA A GARDNER ON 02/29/1984 | |
January 20, 1984 | Docket Event | MOTION - OTHER (MOT TO ADVANCE) WAS FILED BY TERESA A GARDNER ON 01/20/1984 | |
October 06, 1983 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY KEATH L BILLS ON 10/06/1983 | |
September 26, 1983 | Docket Event | MOTION - OTHER (MOT TO ADVANCE) WAS FILED BY TERESA A GARDNER ON 09/26/1983 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.