Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Richardson, Steve, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rowe, Anthony Drew, Esq., against Jones, Annette, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2004 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 06, 2004 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 04, 2004 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
February 03, 2004 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
February 03, 2004 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
January 15, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
December 29, 2003 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.