Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paul Zdrodowski, filed a(n) Summary Action case against 2710 Nomad Deluxe, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategorySummary Action |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeCompleted-Other Summary Proceeding |
Order Show Cause - GRANTED by Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M
Date: November 04, 2022Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge KEVIN M. SHANAHAN, A.J.S.C.
Date: November 04, 2022Proof Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL ZDRODOWSKI
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT - GRANTED by Judge KEVIN M. SHANAHAN, A.J.S.C.
Date: February 13, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 05, 2022Order For Hearing Date - GRANTED by Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M
Date: December 08, 2022Order For Hearing Date - GRANTED by Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M re: Verified Complaint [LCV20223860373] | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT - GRANTED by Judge KEVIN M. SHANAHAN, A.J.S.C. | |
February 13, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | ||
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PAUL ZDRODOWSKI | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: PROOF OF SERVICE [LCV2023513511] -An Order to show cause has been scheduled for the above matter on 2/13/23 at 9 AM with Judge Shanahan. At that time participants shall dial 908 824 9723. Enter meeting number 13660#, Access code 4269066#. | |
January 11, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | ||
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order For Hearing Date - GRANTED by Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: COMPLAINT [LCV20223860373] is rescheduled on 02/13/2023 with Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video. | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: ORDER FOR HEARING DATE [LCV20224167336] -Order to Show Cause scheduled on 1/11/23 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shanahan. At that time participants shall dial 908 824 9723. Enter meeting number 13660# and attendee access code 4269066#. | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: COMPLAINT [LCV20223860373] is rescheduled on 01/11/2023 with Judge SHANAHAN, KEVIN, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.