Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
New Jersey Manufacturers Ins, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lawrence F Walker, against Vitaliy Meyko, represented by Vito A Pinto, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by PINTO, VITO, A of WADE CLARK MULCAHY LLP on behalf of VITALIY MEYKO, VITALIY MEYKO against A/S/O JUDITH PORTIELES | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order To Refer To Mediator Without Stay - GRANTED by Judge ONEILL, MICHAEL, F | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge ONEILL, MICHAEL, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20223567976] | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by PINTO, VITO, A of WADE CLARK MULCAHY LLP on behalf of VITALIY MEYKO, VITALIY MEYKO against A/S/O JUDITH PORTIELES | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by PINTO, VITO, A of WADE CLARK MULCAHY LLP on behalf of VITALIY MEYKO, VITALIY MEYKO against A/S/O JUDITH PORTIELES | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: VITALIY MEYKO | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by WALKER, LAWRENCE, F of COZEN O'CONNOR PC on behalf of A/S/O JUDITH PORTIELES against VITALIY MEYKO, VITALIY MEYKO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.