Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kerri S Flynn, against Lawrence A Devlin, represented by Garrett Timothy Stein, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Lawrence A Devlin. Bank of America claims that the defendant resides in the county where the action is brought. Bank of America is a national banking association and is the successor-in-interes...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 14, 2022Affidavit Of Service submitted by Court
Date: August 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by FLYNN, KERRI, S of MULLOOLY JEFFREY ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LAWRENCE A DEVLIN | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by STEIN, GARRETT, TIMOTHY of ROBERT S. GITMEID & ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of LAWRENCE A DEVLIN against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service submitted by Court | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for WRN-L-000163-22 submitted by FLYNN, KERRI S, MULLOOLY JEFFREY ROONEY & FLYNN, LLP on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against LAWRENCE A DEVLIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.