Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Doris Meixsell, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Robert Jonathan Banas, against Complete Care At Brakeley Park, Felix P Foschetti, D.O., John Doe 1-10, St. Luke'S Hospital, Warren County Familypractice, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
This complaint is filed by Doris Meixsell, as the Executor of the Estate of Theodore Meixsell, against Complete Care at Brakeley Park, St. Luke's Hospital - Warren Campus, Felix P. Foschetti, Jr., D.O., Warren County Family Practice Associates, P.A.,...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 06, 2022Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge ROBERT A BALLARD
Date: July 06, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 21, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 19, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 17, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 17, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 19, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 11, 2022 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | ||
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by BANAS, ROBERT, JONATHAN of EICHEN CRUTCHLOW ZASLOW, LLP on behalf of AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF THEODORE MEIXSELL, DECEASED against COMPLETE CARE AT BRAKELEY PARK, - WARREN CAMPUS, FELIX P FOSCHETTI, D.O., ASSOCIATES, P.A., JOHN DOE 1-10 *LINKED FILING* | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 07/15/2022 re: Verified Complaint [LCV20222477103] | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BANAS, ROBERT, JONATHAN of EICHEN CRUTCHLOW ZASLOW, LLP on behalf of AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF THEODORE MEIXSELL, DECEASED against ASSOCIATES, P.A. | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge ROBERT A BALLARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.