Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Berzkup Nj Realty, Specialty Rx, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Abraham S Beinhorn, against Travelers Indemnitycompany, Travelers Insurancecompanies, in the jurisdiction of Union County, NJ, . Union County, NJ Superior Courts with Camille M Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationUnion County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Another Court |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 21, 2018Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge KENNY, CAMILLE, M
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Complaint - GRANTED by Judge KENNY, CAMILLE, M | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL submitted by HAGER, RACHEL, R of FINAZZO COSSOLINI O'LEARY MEOLA & HAGER, LLC on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANIES, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY against BERZKUP NJ REALTY, SPECIALTY RX, INC. | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by BEINHORN, ABRAHAM, S of JACOBOWITZ NEWMAN TVERSKY LLP on behalf of BERZKUP NJ REALTY, SPECIALTY RX, INC. against TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANIES, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for UNN-L-003973-18 submitted by BEINHORN, ABRAHAM S, JACOBOWITZ NEWMAN TVERSKY LLP on behalf of SPECIALTY RX, INC., BERZKUP NJ REALTY against TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANIES, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.