Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nick Dawson, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Cj Griffin, against Borough Of Kenilworth, Laura Reinertsen, in the jurisdiction of Union County, NJ, . Union County, NJ Superior Courts with Camille M Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2018 |
CategoryOpen Public Records Act (Summary Action) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationUnion County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 18, 2018LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 06, 2019LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 08, 2019ORDER INTERVENE-Granted by Judge KENNY, CAMILLE, M re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20182163972]
Date: January 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2019 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 06, 2019 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SHOW CAUSE-Denied by Judge KENNY, CAMILLE, M re: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING [LCV20181886145] | |
January 25, 2019 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: CAMILLE M KENNY |
||
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by CAPECE, FRANK, G of GARRUBBO & CAPECE PC on behalf of LAURA REINERTSEN, BOROUGH OF KENILWORTH against NICK DAWSON *LINKED FILING* | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by ZOLLER, MICHAEL, J of PASHMAN STEIN WALDER HAYDEN, PC on behalf of NICK DAWSON against LAURA REINERTSEN, BOROUGH OF KENILWORTH, NJSACOP *LINKED FILING* | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER INTERVENE-Granted by Judge KENNY, CAMILLE, M re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20182163972] | |
January 11, 2019 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO INTERVENE
Judge: CAMILLE M KENNY |
||
January 11, 2019 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: CAMILLE M KENNY |
||
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20182163972] -Physical courtesy copy required. Please have one delivered to the judge's chambers by Monday, January 7, 2019. The judge will not consider your motion if a courtesy copy is not delivered. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.