Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maria Palacios, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard Lee Kuhrt, against Abc Corporations, Ivy Hill Park Apts, Ivy Hill Park Section,4 Inc., John Doe, represented by David Steven Kaplan, in the jurisdiction of Union County, NJ, . Union County, NJ Superior Courts with MARK P CIARROCCA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationUnion County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by KAPLAN, DAVID, STEVEN of HICKEY SMITH on behalf of IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS against MARIA PALACIOS | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 04, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: MARK P CIARROCCA |
||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by KAPLAN, DAVID, STEVEN of HICKEY SMITH on behalf of IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS against MARIA PALACIOS, ABC CORPORATIONS, JOHN DOE *LINKED FILING* | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 12/01/2020 re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV20202037980] | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 11/11/2020 will be decided on 12/04/2020. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV20202037980] | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT submitted by KAPLAN, DAVID, STEVEN of HICKEY SMITH on behalf of IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS against MARIA PALACIOS *LINKED FILING* | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by KAPLAN, DAVID, STEVEN of HICKEY SMITH on behalf of IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS against MARIA PALACIOS | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by KUHRT, RICHARD, LEE of KUHRT, FEMIA & KUHRT, LLC on behalf of MARIA PALACIOS against IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS, ABC CORPORATIONS, JOHN DOE | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by KUHRT, RICHARD, LEE of KUHRT, FEMIA & KUHRT, LLC on behalf of MARIA PALACIOS against IVY HILL PARK SECTION,4 INC., IVY HILL PARK APTS, ABC CORPORATIONS, JOHN DOE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.