Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbara Perchaluk, Casimir Perchaluk, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Paul A O'Connor, against Abc Corporation 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Michael I Goldberger, M.D., Tri-County Orthopedics, represented by Robert Thomas Evers, in the jurisdiction of Union County, NJ, . Union County, NJ Superior Courts with Dara A Govan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDara A Govan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2023 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationUnion County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Casimir Perchaluk and Barbara Perchaluk against Michael I. Goldberger, M.D., Tri-County Orthopedics, John Doe 1-5, and ABC Corporation 1-5. The complaint alleges medical malpractice and seeks damages, inter...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by LA BOMBARDI, HEATHER, M of MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN on behalf of MICHAEL I GOLDBERGER, M.D., TRI-COUNTY ORTHOPEDICS against CASIMIR PERCHALUK, BARBARA PERCHALUK | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by EVERS, ROBERT, THOMAS of MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN on behalf of MICHAEL I GOLDBERGER, M.D., TRI-COUNTY ORTHOPEDICS against CASIMIR PERCHALUK | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by O'CONNOR, PAUL, A of O'CONNOR PARSONS LANE & NOBLE LLC on behalf of CASIMIR PERCHALUK, BARBARA PERCHALUK against MICHAEL I GOLDBERGER, M.D., TRI-COUNTY ORTHOPEDICS, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORPORATION 1-5 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by O'CONNOR, PAUL, A of O'CONNOR PARSONS LANE & NOBLE LLC on behalf of CASIMIR PERCHALUK, BARBARA PERCHALUK against MICHAEL I GOLDBERGER, M.D., TRI-COUNTY ORTHOPEDICS, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORPORATION 1-5 | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for UNN-L-001574-23 submitted by O'CONNOR, PAUL A, O'CONNOR PARSONS LANE & NOBLE LLC on behalf of CASIMIR PERCHALUK, BARBARA PERCHALUK against MICHAEL I GOLDBERGER, M.D., TRI-COUNTY ORTHOPEDICS, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORPORATION 1-5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.