Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Highland Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert L Hornby, against David Baran, Imperial Metalwerks,Inc., in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: VICKI A CITRINO |
||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/28/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20232203824] | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by HORNBY, ROBERT, L of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of HIGHLAND CAPITAL CORPORATION against IMPERIAL METALWERKS,INC., DAVID BARAN | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by HORNBY, ROBERT, L of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of HIGHLAND CAPITAL CORPORATION against IMPERIAL METALWERKS,INC., DAVID BARAN | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DAVID BARAN | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: IMPERIAL METALWERKS, INC. | |
July 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HORNBY, ROBERT, L of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of HIGHLAND CAPITAL CORPORATION against DAVID BARAN | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HORNBY, ROBERT, L of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of HIGHLAND CAPITAL CORPORATION against DAVID BARAN | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HORNBY, ROBERT, L of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of HIGHLAND CAPITAL CORPORATION against IMPERIAL METALWERKS,INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.