Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fish Tree, Inc., Young C Cho, filed a(n) Actions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs case represented by A Michael Rubin, against 65 Washington Street, Llc, Paterson Planning Board, Tila Naziri, represented by Alfred V Acquaviva, David Scillieri, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Rudolph A Filko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRudolph A Filko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryActions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022Affidavit Of Service submitted by Staff
Date: October 18, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge CAPOSELA, ERNEST, M
Date: April 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: BRIEF [LCV20231917321] -Other A case management conference before the Hon. Rudolph A. Filko, A.J.S.C. has been scheduled for August 16, 2023 at 10:00AM via Zoom. If you have any questions, please contact chambers. | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: BRIEF [LCV20231917321] -OtherA case management conference before the Hon. Rudolph A. Filko, A.J.S.C. has been scheduled for August 16, 2023 at 11:00AM via Zoom. If you have any questions, please contact chambers. | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by ACQUAVIVA, ALFRED, V of ALFRED V ACQUAVIVA LLC on behalf of PATERSON PLANNING BOARD against FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by SCILLIERI, DAVID of DAVID SCILLIERI on behalf of 65 WASHINGTON STREET, LLC, TILA NAZIRI against FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by RUBIN, A, MICHAEL of A. MICHAEL RUBIN on behalf of FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO against PATERSON PLANNING BOARD, 65 WASHINGTON STREET, LLC, TILA NAZIRI | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge CAPOSELA, ERNEST, M | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by SCILLIERI, DAVID of DAVID SCILLIERI on behalf of 65 WASHINGTON STREET, LLC, TILA NAZIRI against FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO, PATERSON PLANNING BOARD | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by ACQUAVIVA, ALFRED, V of ALFRED V ACQUAVIVA LLC on behalf of PATERSON PLANNING BOARD against FISH TREE, INC. | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by RUBIN, A, MICHAEL of A. MICHAEL RUBIN on behalf of FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO against 65 WASHINGTON STREET, LLC, TILA NAZIRI | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by RUBIN, A, MICHAEL of A. MICHAEL RUBIN on behalf of FISH TREE, INC., YOUNG C CHO against PATERSON PLANNING BOARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.