Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
William Godwin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kenneth D Iulo, against Iglesia Centro Biblico La Herm, John Jane Doe, Xyz Co. Corp., in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRECTION: re: [LCV20223341305] Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002318-22 submitted by IULO, KENNETH D, KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of WILLIAM GODWIN against IGLESIA CENTRO BIBLICO LA HERM, JOHN/JANE DOE, XYZ CO./CORP. on 09/15/2022 has been deleted as ordered by Judge CITRINO, VICKI, A - INCORRECT ACCIDENT | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of WILLIAM GODWIN against IGLESIA CENTRO BIBLICO LA HERMOSA, INC. | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of WILLIAM GODWIN against IGLESIA CENTRO BIBLICO LA HERMOSA, INC. | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL [LCV20223600242] -Stip of Dismissal: Venue wrong on stip Please correct and resubmit as:Miscellaneous: deficiency correction, Nancy Ladd 973-653-2910 x 24239 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DELETE-Granted by Judge CITRINO, VICKI, A re: MOTION FOR ORDER TO DELETE [LCV20223343637] | |
October 07, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO DELETE
Judge: VICKI A CITRINO |
||
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/15/2022 will be decided on 10/07/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ORDER TO DELETE [LCV20223343637] | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO DELETE submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of WILLIAM GODWIN against IGLESIA CENTRO BIBLICO LA HERMOSA, INC. | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DELETED - Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002318-22 submitted by IULO, KENNETH D, KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of WILLIAM GODWIN against IGLESIA CENTRO BIBLICO LA HERM, JOHN/JANE DOE, XYZ CO./CORP. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.