Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adugna, Aynalem, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Grogan, Phillip, Martin, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 26, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Time To Trial60 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Returned or Undeliverable Mail 714510-Returned/Undeliverable Mail Filed/Issued By: RETURNED/UNDELIVERABLE MAIL [714510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Other JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] ; ; ; ; |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) 714120-Judgment: Notice of Entry Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 713610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [713610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration 713310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: DECLARATION [713310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 711110-Hearing: Small Claims; Adugna, A. vs. Grogan, P. et al ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 25 2006 Type: 751110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 721110 - After Uncontested Hrg |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 712310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [712310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement 721110-Plaintiffs Statement to Clerk Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT TO CLERK [721110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document: Other 721120-Plaintiffs Claim and Order to Def Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEF [721120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.