Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lorbin Painting Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Broad Atlantic Associates, represented by Keith L Hovey, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruno Mongiardo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2016 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeSettled-While Scheduled For Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 |
ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
||
March 14, 2017 |
ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
||
February 17, 2017 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
||
February 03, 2017 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
||
December 02, 2016 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.