Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) case represented by Lieber Robert T, against Yuko Karjalainen, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Adam E. Jacobs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Letter/Correspondence submitted by Yuko Karjalainen. JEDS EF-565584
Date: February 25, 2021Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | WARRANT OF SATISFACTION submitted by BEST, SCOTT, J of WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against YUKO KARJALAINEN | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge JACOBS, ADAM, E re: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT [SCP2021291736] | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter/Correspondence submitted by Yuko Karjalainen. JEDS EF-565584 | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/17/2021 will be decided on 03/12/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT [SCP2021291736] | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT submitted by BEST, SCOTT, J of WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against YUKO KARJALAINEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.