Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Theologia Papadelias, against Arturo S Medinacuenca, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2019 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault By Clerk |
WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS AND CHATTELS submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: October 17, 2019Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 16, 2019Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 19, 2019Proof of Service from USPS
Date: September 11, 2019Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS AND CHATTELS submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS & CHATTELS submitted by FELT, GERARD, J of PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against ARTURO S MEDINACUENCA | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by ODOGBILI, CHRISTOPHER, P of PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against ARTURO S MEDINACUENCA | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service from USPS | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | A Complaint for PAS-DC-008002-19 submitted by PAPADELIAS, THEOLOGIA , PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against ARTURO S MEDINACUENCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.