Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Tort-Auto case represented by Joshua Daniel Jaffe, against Rodrique Bourguignon, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Frank Covello presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryTort-Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault By Clerk |
DEFICIENCY CORRECTION - ORDER submitted by JAFFE, JOSHUA, DANIEL of STEPHEN E. GERTLER
Date: January 12, 2021Summons UnServed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 05, 2020Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 31, 2021SR38/SR39 uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSHUA DANIEL JAFFE
Date: June 07, 2021STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: July 08, 2021STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: July 27, 2021ORDER- signed by Judge FRANK COVELLO, JSC
Date: March 30, 2021Signed Order uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSHUA DANIEL JAFFE
Date: February 18, 2022RESERVICE submitted by JAFFE, JOSHUA, DANIEL
Date: September 14, 2020ORDER- signed by Judge FRANK COVELLO, JSC
Date: June 26, 2022SR38/SR39 uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSHUA DANIEL JAFFE
Date: July 18, 2022Return Service - Served submitted by Staff
Date: October 21, 2020Return Service - Unserved submitted by Staff
Date: September 02, 2020Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SR38/SR39 uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSHUA DANIEL JAFFE | |
July 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SR38/SR39 submitted by HOCHMAN, MARK, S of STEPHEN E. GERTLER on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCOMPANY against RODRIQUE BOURGUIGNON | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: CONSENT ORDER TO PAY - DJ [SCP20221672218] -Entered in the Civil Judgement and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. | |
July 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER TO PAY - DJ submitted by HOCHMAN, MARK, S of STEPHEN E. GERTLER on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCOMPANY against RODRIQUE BOURGUIGNON | |
June 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER- signed by Judge FRANK COVELLO, JSC | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - NO MOTION submitted by HOCHMAN, MARK, S of STEPHEN E. GERTLER on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCOMPANY against RODRIQUE BOURGUIGNON | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Order uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSHUA DANIEL JAFFE | |
January 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS - DJ submitted by JAFFE, JOSHUA, DANIEL of STEPHEN E. GERTLER on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCOMPANY against RODRIQUE BOURGUIGNON | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.