Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Retail Recovery Svc Nj Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Raymond F Meisenbacher, against Barbara Armfield, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault By Clerk |
SIGNED - WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST WAGES submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: April 11, 2017Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 12, 2017Court Officer Wage Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 26, 2021Court Officer Wage Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 20, 2017Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 26, 2021Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Officer Wage Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SIGNED - WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST WAGES assigned to MORRIS COUNTY SE, RVICE submitted by Case Management Staff | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAGE EXECUTION submitted by MEISENBACHER, RAYMOND, F of RAYMOND MEISENBACHER AND SONS, PC on behalf of RETAIL RECOVERY SVC NJ INC against BARBARA ARMFIELD | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Court Officer Wage Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | SIGNED - WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST WAGES submitted by Case Management Staff | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Application For Wage Execution submitted by MEISENBACHER, RAYMOND, F of RAYMOND MEISENBACHER AND SONS, PC on behalf of RETAIL RECOVERY SVC NJ INC against BARBARA ARMFIELD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.