Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher P Odogbili, against Jose C Pagan, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2015 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedJune 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
Signed Order submitted by Court
Date: March 30, 2017Miscellaneous Document-WRIT RETURNED submitted by Court
Date: May 31, 2017Signed Order submitted by Court
Date: March 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document-WRIT RETURNED submitted by Court | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Signed Order submitted by Court | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service submitted by AYOUB, RITA, E of PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against JOSE C PAGAN | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof Of Service submitted by AYOUB, RITA, E of PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against JOSE C PAGAN | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Signed Order submitted by Court | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Order - No Motion submitted by S. LUNDY of PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against JOSE C PAGAN | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document submitted by G. YAW of PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP on behalf of DISCOVER BANK against JOSE C PAGAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.