Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paccar Financial Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by A William Henkel, against Allways Paving Llc, Harry Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Mark A Troncone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiff PACCAR Financial Corp. against Defendants Allways Paving LLC and Harry Harrison. The complaint alleges breach of contract and breach of personal guaranty. The Plaintiff seeks damages and a Writ of...
Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge Mark A. Troncone, JSC
Date: September 30, 2022TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: MARK A TRONCONE |
||
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL submitted by HENKEL, A, WILLIAM of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP. against ALLWAYS PAVING LLC, HARRY HARRISON | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 11/30/2022 re: Verified Complaint [LCV20223505367] | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by HENKEL, A, WILLIAM of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP. against ALLWAYS PAVING LLC, HARRY HARRISON | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/30/2022 will be decided on 12/02/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: COMPLAINT [LCV20223505367] | |
October 01, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Verified Complaint for OCN-L-002158-22 submitted by HENKEL, A WILLIAM, FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP. against ALLWAYS PAVING LLC, HARRY HARRISON | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge Mark A. Troncone, JSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.