Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Solomon Gudkov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian R Goodman, against Abc Corporation 1-10, David M Kraftmann, Denise M Russo, John Does #1-10, Minora Kraftmann, (total of 5) See All represented by Beth M Csontos, Robert J Ritacco, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 10, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 18, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 15, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management on CONSOLIDATED CASE OCN-L -001623-22 | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by GOODMAN, BRIAN, R of PALMISANO & GOODMAN P.A. on behalf of SOLOMON GUDKOV against DAVID M KRAFTMANN | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management on CONSOLIDATED CASE OCN-L -001623-22 | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
||
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by RITACCO, ROBERT, J of LEYDEN CAPOTORTO RITACCO CORRIGAN & SHEEHY on behalf of DAVID M KRAFTMANN, MINORA KRAFTMANN against SOLOMON GUDKOV, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATION 1-10, DENISE M RUSSO *LINKED FILING* | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 07/06/2023 re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20231789126] | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by RITACCO, ROBERT, J of LEYDEN CAPOTORTO RITACCO CORRIGAN & SHEEHY on behalf of DAVID M KRAFTMANN, MINORA KRAFTMANN against SOLOMON GUDKOV, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATION 1-10, DENISE M RUSSO *LINKED FILING* | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/12/2023 will be decided on 07/07/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20231789126] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.