Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nicholas Steele, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thomas F Shebell, against 0 John Jane Doe, Constance A Verdesco, represented by Eleanore A Rogalski, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 04, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 04, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by SHEBELL, THOMAS, F of SHEBELL & SHEBELL, LLC on behalf of NICHOLAS STEELE against CONSTANCE A VERDESCO | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by ROGALSKI, ELEANORE, A of LAW OFFICES OF PATRICIA A. PALMA on behalf of CONSTANCE A VERDESCO against NICHOLAS STEELE | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by SHEBELL, THOMAS, F of SHEBELL & SHEBELL, LLC on behalf of NICHOLAS STEELE against CONSTANCE A VERDESCO, ABC CPMPANY(IES) 1-10, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) 1-10 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for OCN-L-002021-22 submitted by SHEBELL, THOMAS F, SHEBELL & SHEBELL, LLC on behalf of NICHOLAS STEELE against CONSTANCE A VERDESCO, ABC COMPANY(IES) 1-10, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.