Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Michele Hopler, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Donald Williams Bedell, against 10 Abc Corporations #1-, John Does #1-10, Robert Engo, represented by Kevin F Sheehy, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by SHEEHY, KEVIN, F of LEYDEN CAPOTORTO RITACCO CORRIGAN & SHEEHY on behalf of ROBERT ENGO against MICHELE HOPLER, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS #1-10 | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/02/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20232233677] | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by BEDELL, DONALD, WILLIAMS of DONALD W. BEDELL on behalf of MICHELE HOPLER against ROBERT ENGO, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS #1-10 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by SHEEHY, KEVIN, F of LEYDEN CAPOTORTO RITACCO CORRIGAN & SHEEHY on behalf of ROBERT ENGO against MICHELE HOPLER, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS #1-10 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by BEDELL, DONALD, WILLIAMS of DONALD W. BEDELL on behalf of MICHELE HOPLER against ROBERT ENGO, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS #1-10 | |
January 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for OCN-L-002019-22 submitted by BEDELL, DONALD WILLIAMS, DONALD W. BEDELL on behalf of MICHELE HOPLER against ROBERT ENGO, JOHN DOES #1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS #1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.