Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Christina S Balestriere, Kristen Cobo, Roxana M Russo Caivano, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Anthony Philip Caivano, John D Coyle, against Anthony P Caivano, Christina S Balestriere, Jane Doe 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Katrina Albo, (total of 7) See All represented by Corinne M Mullen, John D Coyle, Ronald T Nagle, Walter Harold Schneider, in the jurisdiction of Morris County, NJ, . Morris County, NJ Superior Courts with Marcy M Mcmann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryDefamation |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMorris County, NJ |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Roxana M. Russo Caivano against defendants Thomas Seretis, Christina Scarbrough Balestriere, Kristen Cobo, and Katrina Albo. The plaintiff, Roxana M. Russo Caivano, is a resident of Succasunna, Roxbury Township, New Jersey,...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 18, 2023Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge MCMANN, MARCY, M
Date: November 02, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 05, 2024Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge MCMANN, MARCY, M
Date: February 09, 2024COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 24, 2023Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge IRONSON, DAVID, H
Date: July 27, 2023CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge IRONSON, DAVID, H re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20232242758]
Date: August 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge MCMANN, MARCY, M re: CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV2024605691] | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge MCMANN, MARCY, M re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV2024451806] | |
March 15, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: MARCY M MCMANN |
||
March 14, 2024 |
PROCEEDING
Judge: MEDIATOR M EISNER |
||
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by CAIVANO, ANTHONY, PHILIP of ANTHONY P. CAIVANO on behalf of ROXANA M RUSSO CAIVANO against CHRISTINA S BALESTRIERE, KRISTIN COBO *LINKED FILING* | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/07/2024 will be decided on 03/15/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV2024605691] | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by COYLE, JOHN, D of COYLE & MORRIS LLP on behalf of CHRISTINA S BALESTRIERE, KRISTEN COBO against ROXANA M RUSSO CAIVANO, ANTHONY P CAIVANO *LINKED FILING* | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by COYLE, JOHN, D of COYLE & MORRIS LLP on behalf of CHRISTINA S BALESTRIERE, KRISTEN COBO against ROXANA M RUSSO CAIVANO, ANTHONY P CAIVANO *LINKED FILING* | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | The "Proceeding" Proceeding for MRS-L-000485-23 has been scheduled for 03/14/2024. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.