Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kroll Commercial Realty, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lawrence Charles Kroll, against Chris Murray, Star X, Inc., represented by Malcolm, J Mc Pherson, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Laurence J Bravman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurence J Bravman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 23, 2023Arbitration Award submitted by Court
Date: July 19, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 05, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award submitted by Court | |
July 19, 2023 |
ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: LORETTA H YIN |
||
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20223420570] -ARBITRATION 7/19.ARBITRATOR LORETTA YIN.EMAIL PRINCETONADR@GMAIL | |
June 28, 2023 |
ARBITRATION HEARING
Judge: BARBARA TRZASKA |
||
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by MC PHERSON, MALCOLM,, J of MALCOLM MCPHERSON, JR., PC on behalf of STAR X, INC., CHRISTOPHER MURRAY against KROLL COMMERCIAL REALTY, LLC | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: ADJOURNMENT REQUEST [LCV20231868238] -6-28-23 ARBITRATION HEARING HAS BEEN ADJOURNED TO 7-19-23 | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Arbitration Hearing" Proceeding for MID-L-004791-22 has been re-scheduled as a "Arbitration Hearing" Proceeding for 07/19/2023. | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Arbitration Hearing" Proceeding for MID-L-004791-22 scheduled for 06/28/2023 has been: "Adjourned-vacation". | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.