Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ambrocio Mejia, Jose Del Rosario, Robin J Mata-Alvarez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Angelo Jamie Vasquez, William Blair Foti, against Abc Corp., Jane Doe, John Doe, Manuel L Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with J R Corman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ R Corman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Robin J. Mata-Alvarez, Ambrocio Mejia, and Jose Del Rosario, against the defendants, Manuel L. Cruz, John Doe, Jane Doe, and ABC Corp. The incident occurred on December 19, 2020, at the intersection of Prosp...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 22, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 27, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Judge: J R CORMAN |
||
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: PROOF OF MAILING [LCV20232190478] -The return receipt card or unclaimed certified mail is not attached per R. 4:4-7 | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/27/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE [LCV20232199991] | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE submitted by NATIELLO, MICHAEL of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of ROBIN J MATA-ALVAREZ, AMBROCIO MEJIA against JOSE DEL ROSARIO, MANUEL L CRUZ, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, ABC CORP. | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF MAILING submitted by NATIELLO, MICHAEL of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of ROBIN J MATA-ALVAREZ, AMBROCIO MEJIA against JOSE DEL ROSARIO, MANUEL L CRUZ, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, ABC CORP. | |
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by VASQUEZ, ANGELO, JAMIE of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of ROBIN J MATA-ALVAREZ, AMBROCIO MEJIA, JOSE DEL ROSARIO against MANUEL L CRUZ, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, ABC CORP. | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by FOTI, WILLIAM, BLAIR of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of ROBIN J MATA-ALVAREZ, AMBROCIO MEJIA, JOSE DEL ROSARIO against MANUEL L CRUZ | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by FOTI, WILLIAM, BLAIR of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of ROBIN J MATA-ALVAREZ, AMBROCIO MEJIA, JOSE DEL ROSARIO against MANUEL L CRUZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.