Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aria Inhulsen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John J Pisano, against Leo Rosenzweig, represented by Kimberly A Hoehing, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Alberto Rivas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlberto Rivas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 22, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by HOEHING, KIMBERLY, A of LAW OFFICE OF NANCY L CALLEGHER on behalf of LEO ROSENZWEIG against ARIA INHULSEN | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20231970890] -Discovery is extended to 10/23/2023 per R. 4:24-1 (c). | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by HOEHING, KIMBERLY, A of FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on behalf of LEO ROSENZWEIG against ARIA INHULSEN | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MID-L-004740-22 submitted by PISANO, JOHN J, JOHN JUDE PISANO on behalf of ARIA INHULSEN against LEO ROSENZWEIG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.