Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Julia Miranda Depineda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patrick Kelly, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, -10 John And Jane Does 1, Ismael Juarez-Martinez, Soriano P. Landscaping Llc, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Alberto Rivas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlberto Rivas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
This complaint is filed by Julia Miranda DePineda against Ismael Juarez-Martinez, Soriano P Landscaping LLC, John and Jane Does 1-10, and ABC Corporations 1-10. The complaint alleges that on June 1, 2021, Julia Miranda DePineda's vehicle was struck b...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by KELLY, PATRICK of GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD, LLP on behalf of JULIA MIRANDA DEPINEDA against ISMAEL JUAREZ-MARTINEZ, SORIANO P. LANDSCAPING LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by KELLY, PATRICK of GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD, LLP on behalf of JULIA MIRANDA DEPINEDA against ISMAEL JUAREZ-MARTINEZ, SORIANO P. LANDSCAPING LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by KELLY, PATRICK of GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD, LLP on behalf of JULIA MIRANDA DEPINEDA against ISMAEL JUAREZ-MARTINEZ, SORIANO P. LANDSCAPING LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MID-L-002942-23 submitted by KELLY, PATRICK , GINARTE GALLARDO GONZALEZ WINOGRAD, LLP on behalf of JULIA MIRANDA DEPINEDA against ISMAEL JUAREZ-MARTINEZ, SORIANO P. LANDSCAPING LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.