Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bobs Discount Furniture Llc, Thamara Lamarre, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Edward P Shamy, Kevin D London, against 426 Royal Llc, Bobs Discount Furniture Llc, Bobs Furniture, Onyx Management Group, Royal Of Amercia Management Ll, (total of 7) See All represented by Kevin D London, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Gary K Wolinetz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Order Of Dismissal/Case Settled - GRANTED by Judge HAPPAS, JAMIE, D
Date: September 21, 2018Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge HAPPAS, JAMIE, D
Date: June 20, 2018Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by EDWARD P SHAMY JR
Date: May 18, 2017Affidavit Of Services uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by EDWARD P SHAMY JR
Date: August 15, 2017Letter Memorandum submitted by Court
Date: March 20, 2017Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by EDWARD P SHAMY JR
Date: July 14, 2017LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by LONDON, KEVIN, D of LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E STAEHLE on behalf of BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC against THAMARA LAMARRE | |
October 12, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMIE D HAPPAS |
||
October 03, 2018 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: BARBARA TRZASKA |
||
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Of Dismissal/Case Settled - GRANTED by Judge HAPPAS, JAMIE, D | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 09/21/2018 re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20181621145] | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by SHAMY, EDWARD, P of EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR. on behalf of THAMARA LAMARRE against BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS FURNITURE, 426 ROYAL LLC, ROYAL OF AMERICA MANAGEMENT LLC ET AL. | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/18/2018 will be decided on 10/12/2018. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20181621145] | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SHAMY, EDWARD, P of EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR. on behalf of THAMARA LAMARRE against BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS FURNITURE, 426 ROYAL LLC, ROYAL OF AMERICA MANAGEMENT LLC ET AL. | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by SHAMY, EDWARD, P of EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR. on behalf of THAMARA LAMARRE against BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS FURNITURE, 426 ROYAL LLC, ROYAL OF AMERICA MANAGEMENT LLC ET AL. | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by SHAMY, EDWARD, P of EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR. on behalf of THAMARA LAMARRE against BOBS DISCOUNT FURNITURE LLC, BOBS FURNITURE, 426 ROYAL LLC, ROYAL OF AMERICA MANAGEMENT LLC, 426 ROYAL LLC ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.