Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Basf Corporation, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lynda Anne Bennett, against Ace American Insurance Company, Aiu Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risksus, Allianz Versicherungs-Ag, Allstate Insurance Company, (total of 36) See All represented by Stefano V Calogero, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Gary K Wolinetz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2024 |
CategoryComplex Commercial |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This legal document is a complaint filed by BASF Corporation against multiple insurance companies for breach of contract and declaratory relief regarding insurance coverage for lawsuits related to the surfactant Lodyne in Aqueous Film-Forming Foams (...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by CALOGERO, STEFANO, V of WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY against BASF CORPORATION | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING [LCV2024692192] -Appearance for Heather Weaver has been entered. | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) [LCV2024692111] -This is a duplicate filing. | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING [LCV2024692192] -Your filing has been marked as non-conforming: attorney Heather A. Weaver's attorney status is admin ineligible. Please contact Trenton regarding your CAMS account. | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by JESSE, ERIC of LOWENSTEIN SANDLER LLP on behalf of BASF CORPORATION against MUNICH REINSURANCE AMERICA, INC., NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA, NEW ENGLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW ENGLAND RE ET AL. | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by WEAVER, HEATHER, ASHLEY of LOWENSTEIN SANDLER LLP on behalf of BASF CORPORATION against MUNICH REINSURANCE AMERICA, INC., NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA, NEW ENGLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW ENGLAND RE ET AL. | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by JESSE, ERIC of LOWENSTEIN SANDLER LLP on behalf of BASF CORPORATION against MUNICH REINSURANCE AMERICA, INC., NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA, NEW ENGLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW ENGLAND RE ET AL. | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MID-L-001648-24 submitted by BENNETT, LYNDA ANNE, LOWENSTEIN SANDLER LLP on behalf of BASF CORPORATION against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, AIU INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US, ALLIANZ VERSICHERUNGS-AG, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.