Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Edison Metuchen Orthopaedic, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jerome F O'Brien, against Jose Menjivar, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with J. Randall Corman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Randall Corman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault By Clerk |
Execution Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 15, 2020Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 05, 2020Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 17, 2019Return Service - Served submitted by Court
Date: January 10, 2020STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: December 08, 2021WRIT OF EXECUTION AGAINST GOODS AND CHATTELS submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: February 18, 2020STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff
Date: November 30, 2021EXECUTION RETURN - PARTIALLY SATISFIED submitted by Court Officer JAMIE KELLY
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ submitted by Case Management Staff | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRECTED: DEFICIENCY CORRECTION - DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by O'BRIEN, JEROME, F of O'BRIEN & TAYLOR | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ SCP20212291878 -Notice that the attorney typed name is missing underneath the signature. | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRECTION: re: [SCP20212331446] DEFICIENCY CORRECTION - DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by O'BRIEN, JEROME, F of O'BRIEN & TAYLOR Filing Type has been changed to STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING - DJ by Case Management Staff | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR DOCKETING submitted by Case Management Staff | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DOCKETING submitted by O'BRIEN, JEROME, F of O'BRIEN & TAYLOR on behalf of EDISON METUCHEN ORTHOPAEDIC against JOSE MENJIVAR | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURN - PARTIALLY SATISFIED submitted by Court Officer JAMIE KELLY | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TURN OVER FUNDS-Granted by Judge CORMAN, J, R re: MOTION TO TURN OVER FUNDS [SCP20201219079] | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TURN OVER FUNDS submitted by O'BRIEN, JEROME, F of O'BRIEN & TAYLOR on behalf of EDISON METUCHEN ORTHOPAEDIC against JOSE MENJIVAR | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TURN OVER FUNDS-Granted by Judge CORMAN, J, R re: MOTION TO TURN OVER FUNDS [SCP2020881503] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.