Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jenny M Rafferty, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carmen M Finegan, against Abc Companies 1-10, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Spinella, John Doe 1-10, represented by Robert Anthony Ballou, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeReinstated |
This complaint is filed by Jenny M. Rafferty against Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Spinella, John Does 1-10, and ABC Companies 1-10. The complaint alleges that on November 18, 2020, Jenny M. Rafferty was walking on the premises located at 4100 ...
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 13, 2023Order Remand Final - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H
Date: March 07, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 15, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by BALLOU, ROBERT, ANTHONY of GARVEY BALLOU on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION against JENNY M RAFFERTY, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC COMPANIES 1-10, FRANK SPINELLA | |
May 13, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Remand Final - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL submitted by BALLOU, ROBERT, ANTHONY of GARVEY BALLOU on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION against JENNY M RAFFERTY, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC COMPANIES 1-10, FRANK SPINELLA | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by FINEGAN, CARMEN, M of GERARD C. VINCE, LLC on behalf of JENNY M RAFFERTY against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC COMPANIES 1-10, FRANK SPINELLA | |
September 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MER-L-001665-22 submitted by FINEGAN, CARMEN M, GERARD C. VINCE, LLC on behalf of JENNY M RAFFERTY against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC COMPANIES 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.