Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lilly L Banzragch, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gabriel R Lependorf, against Mohammed K Husseini, Rasha Darah-Tahhan, represented by Jill Lynn Teague, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R Brian Mclaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR Brian Mclaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Lilly L. Banzragch against Mohammad K. Husseini and Rasha Darah-Tahhan in the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Mercer County. The complaint alleges that on January 22, 2021, Lilly L. Banzragch wa...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20232015162] -The DED is now 11/23/23 | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by LEPENDORF, GABRIEL, R of LEPENDORF & SILVERSTEIN, PC on behalf of LILLY L BANZRAGCH against MOHAMMED K HUSSEINI, RASHA DARAH-TAHHAN | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by LEPENDORF, GABRIEL, R of LEPENDORF & SILVERSTEIN, PC on behalf of LILLY L BANZRAGCH against MOHAMMED K HUSSEINI, RASHA DARAH-TAHHAN | |
April 28, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by TEAGUE, JILL, LYNN of CHARLES A LITTLE JR on behalf of MOHAMMED K HUSSEINI, RASHA DARAH-TAHHAN against LILLY L BANZRAGCH *LINKED FILING* | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by TEAGUE, JILL, LYNN of CHARLES A LITTLE JR on behalf of MOHAMMED K HUSSEINI, RASHA DARAH-TAHHAN against LILLY L BANZRAGCH *LINKED FILING* | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 04/12/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231247065] | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/12/2023 will be decided on 04/28/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231247065] | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by TEAGUE, JILL, LYNN of CHARLES A LITTLE JR on behalf of MOHAMMED K HUSSEINI, RASHA DARAH-TAHHAN against LILLY L BANZRAGCH | |
September 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.