Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Emad Georgee, Major Trucking, Corp, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bruce D Nimensky, against Aiden Enterprises, Inc, Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc, Does 1-10, Expresstrans Logistics, (total of 7) See All represented by Mohammad Basim Pathan, Paul E Fernandez, Shawn D Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Massi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Massi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231037236] -Other The Court believes that there was no ambiguity in the Court's order. Thank you. MLS | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NIMENSKY, BRUCE, D of GRAY LAW GROUP, LLC on behalf of MAJOR TRUCKING, CORP, EMAD GEORGEE against AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, PHIL GALLO, AIDEN ENTERPRISES, INC, FREIGHT ON THE WAY, INC. ET AL. | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Granted by Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224410725] | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by PATHAN, MOHAMMAD, BASIM of DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, PHIL GALLO against MAJOR TRUCKING, CORP | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EDWARDS, SHAWN, D of MASELLI, MILLS & FORNAL, P.C. on behalf of AIDEN ENTERPRISES, INC against MAJOR TRUCKING, CORP, EMAD GEORGEE | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/23/2023 re: CROSS MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCE - NO DISMISSAL [LCV2023369911] | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV2023885854] -Other; Aiden Enterprises, Inc. must submit a copy of their agreement with Amazon within the next 10 days. Please submit by March 24th onto eCourts. | |
March 13, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANTHONY M MASSI |
||
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EDWARDS, SHAWN, D of MASELLI, MILLS & FORNAL, P.C. on behalf of AIDEN ENTERPRISES, INC against MAJOR TRUCKING, CORP, EMAD GEORGEE, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, PHIL GALLO ET AL. | |
March 11, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.