Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Louise Dumas, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Zachary M Green, against -10 John And Jane Does 1, Christina M Rapolas, Michael T Rapolas, Jr., Xyz Corp 1-10, represented by Carl Robert Luthman, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R BRIAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR BRIAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 20, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by LUTHMAN, CARL, ROBERT of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of MICHAEL T RAPOLAS, JR., CHRISTINA M RAPOLAS against LOUISE DUMAS | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 20, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by LUTHMAN, CARL, ROBERT of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of MICHAEL T RAPOLAS, JR., CHRISTINA M RAPOLAS against LOUISE DUMAS *LINKED FILING* | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 01/13/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20224428565] | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by LUTHMAN, CARL, ROBERT of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of MICHAEL T RAPOLAS, JR., CHRISTINA M RAPOLAS against LOUISE DUMAS *LINKED FILING* | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/23/2022 will be decided on 01/20/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20224428565] | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by LUTHMAN, CARL, ROBERT of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of MICHAEL T RAPOLAS, JR., CHRISTINA M RAPOLAS against LOUISE DUMAS | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by GREEN, ZACHARY, M of JAVERBAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM & SININS on behalf of LOUISE DUMAS against MICHAEL T RAPOLAS, JR., CHRISTINA M RAPOLAS, XYZ CORP 1-10, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.