Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Red Target, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jaclyn S Dopke, against Rafael Caceres, Rohi Transport Llc, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
This complaint is filed by Red Target, LLC d/b/a SCJ Commercial Financial Services against defendants Rohi Transport LLC and Rafael Caceres. The plaintiff alleges that Rohi Transport LLC, the lessee, entered into a non-cancelable commercial equipment...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022Final Judgment By Default submitted by Court
Date: December 20, 2022Writ Of Execution - J submitted by Court
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution - J submitted by Court | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: WRIT OF EXECUTION - J [LCV2023377581] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION - J submitted by DOPKE, JACLYN, S of FLEISCHER FLEISCHER & SUGLIA on behalf of RED TARGET, LLC against ROHI TRANSPORT LLC, RAFAEL CACERES | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J [LCV20224462081] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office J-002728-23 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J submitted by DOPKE, JACLYN, S of FLEISCHER FLEISCHER & SUGLIA on behalf of RED TARGET, LLC against ROHI TRANSPORT LLC, RAFAEL CACERES | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT [LCV20224457951] -Please disregard this Final Judgment By Default. Incorrect Amount is on this document. | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by DOPKE, JACLYN, S of FLEISCHER FLEISCHER & SUGLIA on behalf of RED TARGET, LLC against ROHI TRANSPORT LLC, RAFAEL CACERES | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment By Default submitted by Court | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: RAFAEL CACERES | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT [LCV20224077483] -Default entered a/t defendants. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.