Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bolivar Reyesbertre, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kevin L Parsons, against Abc Corps. 1 - 10, Bharti Parasher, John Does 1 - 10, represented by Gregory J Guido, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Massi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Massi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSettled--By Conference With Judge |
This complaint is filed by Bolivar Reyesbertre against the defendants Bharti Parasher, John Does 1-10, and ABC Corps. 1-10. The complaint alleges that on October 14, 2021, Bolivar Reyesbertre was involved in a motor vehicle collision on Route 541 in ...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 14, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by GUIDO, GREGORY, J of TRAVELERS INSURANCE CO on behalf of BHARTI PARASHER against BOLIVAR REYESBERTRE | |
May 10, 2023 |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
April 27, 2023 |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: F P MC MANIMON |
||
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF JUDGMENT submitted by PARSONS, KEVIN, L of HANUS & PARSONS, LLC on behalf of BOLIVAR REYESBERTRE against BHARTI PARASHER, JOHN DOES 1 - 10, ABC CORPS. 1 - 10 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by GUIDO, GREGORY, J of TRAVELERS INSURANCE CO on behalf of BHARTI PARASHER against BOLIVAR REYESBERTRE | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PARSONS, KEVIN, L of HANUS & PARSONS, LLC on behalf of BOLIVAR REYESBERTRE against BHARTI PARASHER, JOHN DOES 1 - 10, ABC CORPS. 1 - 10 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MER-L-001604-22 submitted by PARSONS, KEVIN L, HANUS & PARSONS, LLC on behalf of BOLIVAR REYESBERTRE against BHARTI PARASHER, JOHN DOES 1 - 10, ABC CORPS. 1 - 10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.