Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pollock, Mark S., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pollock, Mark S, against Bock, Lori, Bock, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 23, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Renewal of Judgment (ISSUED) | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Application: Renewal Judgment | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Pollock, M. vs. Bock, L. et al ; Judge: J21195 Stone Rodney Judge: Stone, Rodney |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Exam: Issued/Filed 227220-Order of Exam Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER OF EXAM ISSUED [227220] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 227110-Abstract: Issued Filed/Issued By: ABSTRACT: ISSUED [227110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Pollock, M. vs. Bock, L. et al ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 5 2006 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.