Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
David Maconi, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mark D Laderman, Phil Cohen, against Corbin Electrical Services Inc, represented by David E Gray, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R Brian Mclaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryEmployment (Other Than Cepa Or Lad) |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 16, 2023Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PHIL COHEN
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by NIMENSKY, BRUCE, D of GRAY LAW GROUP, LLC on behalf of CORBIN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC against DAVID MACONI | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM-Denied by Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20231335496] | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20231335496] -Other: Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, June 9th at 1:30 pm. A zoom link to follow. | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20231335496] is scheduled on 05/26/2023 with Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM
Judge: ANTHONY M MASSI |
||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by GRAY, DAVID, E of GRAY LAW GROUP, LLC on behalf of CORBIN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC against DAVID MACONI *LINKED FILING* | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by COHEN, PHIL of KAMENSKY COHEN & RIECHELSON on behalf of DAVID MACONI against CORBIN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC *LINKED FILING* | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/21/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20231335496] | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by COHEN, PHIL of KAMENSKY COHEN & RIECHELSON on behalf of DAVID MACONI against CORBIN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC *LINKED FILING* | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM submitted by GRAY, DAVID, E of GRAY LAW GROUP, LLC on behalf of CORBIN ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC against DAVID MACONI *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.