Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Valentina Grigoryeva, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Leonard D Weiss, Veronica R Medina, against 5 Abc Corporations 1-3, Crystal L Simicsak, Crystal Simicsak, Fanticy Acres, John Doe 1, (total of 11) See All represented by Dimitri Smirnov, Dmitriy Shakhnevich, Glenn Donald Curving, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with DELIA, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 03, 2022ORDER FOR DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge DELIA, ANTHONY, V re: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [LCV20223063267]
Date: September 09, 2022Order To Amended Order - GRANTED by Judge DELIA, ANTHONY, V
Date: September 09, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 01, 2022Order To Compel Discovery - GRANTED by Judge DELIA, ANTHONY, V
Date: February 14, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 15, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Personal Injury Arbitration" Proceeding for HUD-L-001625-22 has been scheduled for 11/15/2023. | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231631201] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SHAKHNEVICH, DMITRIY of DMITRIY SHAKHNEVICH on behalf of KATSIARYNA DRAZDOVA against VALENTINA GRIGORYEVA *LINKED FILING* | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/24/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231631201] | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by WEISS, LEONARD, D of WEISS GROUP LLC on behalf of VALENTINA GRIGORYEVA against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-35, VICTOR POPOVKIN, FANTICY ACRES, KATSIARYNA DRAZDOVA, JOHN DOE 1 ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20231269468] -The new DED is 06/17/23 | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by MOHAN, ANNE, M of RIKER DANZIG LLP on behalf of FANTICY ACRES, CRYSTAL SIMICSAK, CRYSTAL L SIMICSAK against VALENTINA GRIGORYEVA, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-35, VICTOR POPOVKIN, KATSIARYNA DRAZDOVA, JOHN DOE 1 ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.