Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rajeeah L Jones, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Piotr J Popkowski, against Abc Corp 1-10, Brock K Barberi, Edward J Barberi, John Doe 1-10, Personal Service Insurance, (total of 5) See All represented by Gina M Graham, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ, . Essex County, NJ Superior Courts with SHEILA A VENABLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Another County |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | This case has been transferred from ESX-L-3767-23 to BUR-L-1789-23 | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE-Granted by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV20232110949] | |
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE
Judge: SHEILA A VENABLE |
||
August 04, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE
Judge: SHEILA A VENABLE |
||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/18/2023 will be decided on 08/04/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV20232110949] | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/18/2023 was rescheduled to 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV20232110949] | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE submitted by GRAHAM, GINA, M of USAA on behalf of BROCK K BARBERI, EDWARD J BARBERI against RAJEEAH L JONES, PERSONAL SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC CORP 1-10 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by GRAHAM, GINA, M of USAA on behalf of BROCK K BARBERI, EDWARD J BARBERI against RAJEEAH L JONES, PERSONAL SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ESX-L-003767-23 submitted by POPKOWSKI, PIOTR J, FREDSON STATMORE BITTERMAN LLC on behalf of RAJEEAH L JONES against BROCK K BARBERI, EDWARD J BARBERI, PERSONAL SERVICE INSURANCE, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC CORP 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.