Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ella Doctoroff, D.O., filed a(n) Whistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) case represented by Valerie Palma Deluisi, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, County Of Essex, Dominic Scaglione, Essex County Hospital Center, Frank Del Gaudio, (total of 6) See All represented by Olivia Palamara, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ, . Essex County, NJ Superior Courts with Jeffrey B Beacham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2023 |
CategoryWhistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationEssex County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BEACHAM, JEFFREY, B re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20233241571]
Date: November 06, 2023MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 28, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BEACHAM, JEFFREY, B re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20233241571] | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by PALMA DELUISI, VALERIE of NICHOLAS J. PALMA, ESQ., PC on behalf of ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O. against COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10 ET AL. | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE-Denied by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV20231764428] | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE
Judge: SHEILA A VENABLE |
||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by PALMA DELUISI, VALERIE of NICHOLAS J. PALMA, ESQ., PC on behalf of ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O. against COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10 ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by O'KEEFE, LINA, DEDULIN of ESSEX COUNTY COUNSEL on behalf of COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO against ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O., JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by PALAMARA, OLIVIA of ESSEX COUNTY COUNSEL on behalf of COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO against ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O., JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by PALAMARA, OLIVIA of ESSEX COUNTY COUNSEL on behalf of ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O., JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 against COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO *LINKED FILING* | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE submitted by PALMA DELUISI, VALERIE of NICHOLAS J. PALMA, ESQ., PC on behalf of ELLA DOCTOROFF, D.O. against COUNTY OF ESSEX, ESSEX COUNTY HOSPITAL CENTER, DOMINIC SCAGLIONE, FRANK DEL GAUDIO, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10 ET AL. *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.