Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kirsh, Gelband & Sto Ne, P.A. Vs Mazie David
A Complex Commercial case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ. Judge Keith E Lynott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 06, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 23, 2023
Filing Location
Essex County, NJ
Category
Complex Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Open
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
At all times relevant herein, Kirsch, Gelband & Stone,
P.A. (“KGS” or “Plaintiff”) is a law firm with an office located
at 50 Park Place, Newark, New Jersey.
At all times relevant herein David Mazie (“Mazie”) is an
attorney at law of the State of New Jersey and a partner in the
firm of Mazie Slater Katz and Freeman, LLC (“MSKF”) with an office
at 103 Eisenhower Parkway, Roseland, New Jersey.
ESX-L-003110-20 08/12/2020 3:38:05 PM Pg 2 of 8 Trans ID: LCV20201394986
On or about February 2, 2017, KGS was engaged to handle
a personal injury action on behalf of Maria Moser Meister and her
husband. Maria has suffered egregious and catastrophic injuries
when she was struck by a utility pole.
KGS performed legal services for approximately 3 years
and substantially prepared the case, including but not limited to
the preparing for and attending several mediation sessions in order
to settle the matter.
As part of the settlement discussions with KGS, an offer
of $90 million was made by Verizon New Jersey (“Verizon”), with
the firm indication that millions more would be offered to settle
the case.
On or about August 12, 2019, MSKF filed an appearance to
represent the clients.
On or about August 6, 2019, KGS filed an attorney’s lien
with regard to any fees and costs that may be realized in the
matter.
Within approximately 6 months of Mazie’s appearance, the
matter was settled against Verizon for the sum of $125 million. As
part of the order approving the settlement, the fees shall be
escrowed pending a resolution of the fee dispute between the
attorneys.
Mazie and MSKF have moved in court to keep all of the
fees, despite the fact that substantial work was performed by KGS
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Apr 04, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A
Date: Mar 17, 2022COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Feb 24, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - PARTIAL by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R
Date: Feb 18, 2022COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jan 07, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R
Date: Jan 06, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Dec 25, 2021COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Aug 03, 2021Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R
Date: Jul 28, 2021ORDER TO PAY COUNSEL FEES - Partial by Judge re: 5-DAY ORDER LCV20211232905
Date: May 24, 2021Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A
Date: May 06, 2021Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: Jan 29, 2021LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Dec 19, 2020ORDER FOR DISCOVERY - Granted by Judge re: 5-DAY ORDER LCV20201727857
Date: Sep 30, 2020Order To Transfer To Another Court - DENIED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R
Date: Jul 30, 2020TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 07, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO AMENDED ORDER-Denied by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20231567678] | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 06, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20232894544] | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/20/2023 will be decided on 10/06/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20232894544] | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE *LINKED FILING* | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SOLOMON, ROBERT, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
July 20, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
July 20, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231807886] -The OA/Motion is scheduled for 7/20/23 at 11:00 a.m., moving party shall provide the dial in number needed for the call, please upload a letter with the information. Thanks | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231807886] | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20231567678] is rescheduled on 07/20/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video. | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231638035] is rescheduled on 07/20/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video. | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/14/2023 will be decided on 07/07/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231807886] | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SOLOMON, ROBERT, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20201018268] -The OA/Motion is CONFIRMED FOR 7/20/23 AT 11:00 a.m., by phone- kindly inform all parties of this date. Many Thanks again... | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231804188] -Other [LCV20231804188] DISCOVERY REQUEST MUST BE DONE BY MOTION | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231795588] -The court has proposed another date of 7/20/23 at 11:00 a.m. all counsel contact chambers to confirm. Many thanks 973-776-9507 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231795588] -The date of 6/15/23 at 11:00 a.m. is NOT GOING FORWARD THANKS | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231795588] -Error- typo -the date was 6/15/23 at 11:30 a.m. Not Going Forward Thanks | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by HARRIS, ALLEN, LOUIS of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231795588] -All Counsel kindly contact chambers re a new date 7/5/23 at 2:00 p.m. Thanks 973-776-9507 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231775991] -The OA/Motion has been rescheduled to Thursday 6/15/23 at 11:30 a.m., plaintiff's counsel kindly upload a letter with the dial in number needed for the call and notify all of this new date and time. Many Thanks | |
June 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231775991] -The OA/Motion is adjourned for today at 3:00 p.m., per Judge, we are in the process of rescheduling to another date, we will send a message through ecourts. Kindly inform all parties on this change. Thanks | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231775991] -Kindly call Chambers at 973-776-9507 in regards to the Oral Argument scheduled for today. Thank you. | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: OPPOSITION TO MOTION [LCV20231757550] -The OA/Motion is scheduled for Monday 6/12/23 at 3:00 p.m. moving party kindly upload a letter with the dial in number. Thanks | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral argument has been granted. Hearing is rescheduled on 06/12/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E, Court Room 302. re: CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231638035] | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral argument has been granted. Hearing is rescheduled on 06/12/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E, Court Room 302. re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20231567678] | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT-Denied by Judge MOORE, THOMAS, M re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20231505500] | |
June 05, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 05, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by PIOREK, JOANNA of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN *LINKED FILING* | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH, STONE & MORGAN, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, NAGEL RICE LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20231567678] -The Oral Argument on the motions to Amend and Reconsider to be heard in front of Judge Lynott are adjourned and re-scheduled for Monday June 12 at 3:00 PM. Kindly inform all parties of this change, thank you. | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20231505500] -Oral argument will take place in front of Judge Moore on Monday, June 5th at 3 PM. Please upload a letter with counsels' email addresses for the Zoom link. | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: THOMAS M MOORE |
||
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/25/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231638035] | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for ESX-L-003110-20 scheduled for has been cancelled. | |
May 22, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/10/2023 was rescheduled to 05/26/2023. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20231505500] | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral argument has been granted. Hearing is rescheduled on 06/05/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E, Court Room 302. re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20231505500] | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral argument has been granted. Hearing is rescheduled on 06/05/2023 with Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E, Court Room 302. re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231097709] | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231567466] -The CMC scheduled for Monday May 22, 2023 has moved in time only from 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. kindly inform all parties of this change. Thanks | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/17/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20231567678] | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, FOR MARIA MOSER MEISTER, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SININS, RUBIN, M of JAVERBAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM & SININS on behalf of JUDITH A WAHRENBERGER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC ET AL. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 14, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/10/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20231505500] | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H ET AL. | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231466195] -The CMC scheduled for today, Monday at 2:00 p.m. is adjourned, new date is Tuesday 5/9/23 at 9:00 a.m., kindly inform all parties of this change, per Judge. Thanks | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231442114] -2nd request - CMC 5/8/23 - dial in number for the phone conference - plaintiff's counsel Thanks | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231442114] -The CMC is adjourned to May 8, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Kindly inform all parties of this change. Thank you. | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231442114] -The CMC is scheduled for Thursday 5/4/23 at 3:0 p.m. plaintiff's counsel shall upload a letter with the dial in number needed for the call. Thanks | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231424561] -The CMC is scheduled 5/4/23 at 3:00 p.m., plaintiff's office kindly upload a letter with the dial in number needed for the call. Thanks | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
April 28, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MEISTER PETER H *LINKED FILING* | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/31/2023 was rescheduled to 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231097709] | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/31/2023 will be decided on 04/28/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231097709] | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RECONSIDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPEL DEPOSITION-Denied by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E re: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [LCV2023335096] | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H ET AL. | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against BRUCE H NAGEL | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SOLOMON, ROBERT, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
February 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
February 10, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [LCV2023335096] -The Oral Argument scheduled for 2/10/23 is adjourned to 2/15/23 due to an ongoing jury trial. The telephonic OA will begin at 10:30 a.m. moving party to kindly upload dial-in information for this hearing. Thank you. | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, MEISTER PETER H, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., PHILIP ROSENBACH *LINKED FILING* | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/23/2023 will be decided on 02/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [LCV2023335096] | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MORGAN, RONALD, JOSEPH of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20224467411] -The CMC scheduled for today at 1:00 p.m. is adjourned, per Judge, the new date is 1/5/23 at 11:30 a.m. kindly inform all parties of this change. Thanks | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20224226896] -A Case Management Conference is scheduled for January 3, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiff counsel kindly upload a dial-in number for the telephonic conference. Thank you. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by HARRIS, ALLEN, LOUIS of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, MEISTER PETER H ET AL. | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN against BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, GREGG A STONE | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 04, 2022 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20223832543] -The CMC is scheduled for 2/10/23 at 9:00 a.m., the plaintiff shall upload a letter with the dial in number. Thank you | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER ET AL. | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by PIOREK, JOANNA of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC ET AL. | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 10, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 10, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 10, 2022 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221579980] | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: CROSS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221616785] | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER HOLD IN CONTEMPT-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: CROSS MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT [LCV20221934134] | |
May 27, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 27, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/20/2022 was rescheduled to 06/10/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221616785] | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/19/2022 was rescheduled to 06/10/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221579980] | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/17/2022 was rescheduled to 06/10/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT [LCV20221934134] | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by PIOREK, JOANNA of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/17/2022 will be decided on 05/27/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT [LCV20221934134] | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION HOLD IN CONTEMPT submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/20/2022 will be decided on 05/27/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221616785] | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/19/2022 will be decided on 05/27/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20221579980] | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CounterClaim ,3rd Party Claim W/Jury Demand submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
February 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
February 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO QUASH
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
February 18, 2022 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - PARTIAL by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO QUASH-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV2022470392] | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV2022469950] | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT-Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV2022469002] | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC ET AL. | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE *LINKED FILING* | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE ET AL. | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of GREGG A STONE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC ET AL. | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/02/2022 will be decided on 02/18/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV2022469002] | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/02/2022 will be decided on 02/18/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV2022469950] | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/02/2022 will be decided on 02/18/2022. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV2022470392] | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, GREGG A STONE ET AL. | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV2022198585] | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by STONE, GREGG, A of KIRSCH GELBAND & STONE, PA on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC ET AL. | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, GREGG A STONE ET AL. | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. ET AL. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE ET AL. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by QUINN, THOMAS, F of WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ ET AL LLP on behalf of BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE ET AL. | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: NAGEL RICE LLC | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: BRUCE H NAGEL | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: GREGG A STONE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
December 25, 2021 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by PARAGANO, MICHAEL, J of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC ET AL. | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. | |
December 17, 2021 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 17, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20212532861] | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC ET AL. | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
December 03, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 03, 2021 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/29/2021 was rescheduled to 12/17/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20212532861] | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/29/2021 will be decided on 12/03/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20212532861] | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
October 22, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER/FILE MOTION
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER/FILE MOTION-Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER/FILE MOTION [LCV20212318700] | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
October 08, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO AMENDED ORDER-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20212143398] | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/05/2021 will be decided on 10/22/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER/FILE MOTION [LCV20212318700] | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER/FILE MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BRUCE H NAGEL, NAGEL RICE LLC, GREGG A STONE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, GREGG A STONE ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20212172122] -The attachment is not the Transcript. The attachment is the Transcript Request Form. Please file the correct Transcript as a deficiency correction. | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/15/2021 will be decided on 10/08/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER [LCV20212143398] | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMENDED ORDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H ET AL. | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
August 27, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO QUASH
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO QUASH-Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20211723028] | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H *LINKED FILING* | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by SOLOMON, ROBERT, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H ET AL. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/22/2021 will be decided on 08/27/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20211723028] | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., GREGG A STONE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID A MAZIE against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, GREGG A STONE | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer W/CounterClaim ,3rd Party Claim W/Jury Demand submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [LCV20211261860] | |
June 11, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 11, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20211056863] | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC against MEISTER PETER H *LINKED FILING* | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 28, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/26/2021 was rescheduled to 06/11/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20211056863] | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PAY COUNSEL FEES - Partial by Judge re: 5-DAY ORDER [LCV20211232905] | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/21/2021 will be decided on 06/11/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [LCV20211261860] | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: 5-DAY ORDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against PHILIP ROSENBACH, BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 14, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 14, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO VACATE ORDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 14, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 14, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO INTERVENE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 14, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE ORDER-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER [LCV2021996312] | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TURN OVER FUNDS-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS [LCV20211081878] | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER INTERVENE-Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20211079163] | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CONSOLIDATE CASES-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES [LCV20211079890] | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: REPLY BRIEF submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of PHILIP ROSENBACH against BRUCE NAGEL on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against PETER H MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against PHILIP ROSENBACH on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: The motion filed on 04/28/2021 was rescheduled to 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES LCV20211079976 on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., PHILIP ROSENBACH, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2021 was rescheduled to 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES [LCV20211079890] | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of PHILIP ROSENBACH against BRUCE NAGEL on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., PHILIP ROSENBACH against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/19/2021 was rescheduled to 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER [LCV2021996312] | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: The motion filed on 04/28/2021 was rescheduled to 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS LCV20211081907 on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2021 was rescheduled to 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS [LCV20211081878] | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against PHILIP ROSENBACH, BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES LCV20211079976 on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES [LCV20211079890] | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS [LCV20211081878] | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS LCV20211081907 on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20211079163] | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: The motion filed on 04/28/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE LCV20211079852 on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against PHILIP ROSENBACH, BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TURN OVER FUNDS submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: MOTION TO INTERVENE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of PHILIP ROSENBACH against BRUCE NAGEL on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/26/2021 will be decided on 05/28/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20211056863] | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: Order To Enter Judgment - PARTIAL by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 22, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STAY JUDGMENT-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT [LCV2021989158] | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT [LCV2021989158] is rescheduled on 04/22/2021 with Judge VENA, THOMAS, R. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: Order To Enter Judgment - GRANTED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE ORDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/19/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER [LCV2021996312] | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/16/2021 will be decided on 05/14/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT [LCV2021989158] | |
April 18, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: Letter Of Opinion submitted by Court on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
February 02, 2021 |
PROCEEDING
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EPSTEIN, ADAM, M of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EPSTEIN, ADAM, M of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS [LCV20202373465] | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SCRIVO, THOMAS, P of O'TOOLE SCRIVO, LLC on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 22, 2021 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EPSTEIN, ADAM, M of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of BRUCE NAGEL against MARIA M MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by EPSTEIN, ADAM, M of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/30/2020 will be decided on 01/22/2021. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS [LCV20202373465] | |
December 19, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 16, 2020 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RECONSIDER-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201823460] | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER INTERVENE-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: CROSS MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201883461] | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER INTERVENE-Partial by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201790861] | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: CONSENT ORDER submitted by HANLON, ROBERT, MICHAEL of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP on behalf of VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC against MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
December 04, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 04, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO INTERVENE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by EPSTEIN, ADAM, M of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MARIA M MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER, PETER H MEISTER against BRUCE NAGEL, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER, DEF CORPORATION, NEPTUNE HOLDINGS US CORP, VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC ET AL. on CONSOLIDATED CASE ESX-L -004738-17 | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/08/2020 was rescheduled to 12/04/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201790861] | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/14/2020 was rescheduled to 12/04/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201823460] | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/21/2020 was rescheduled to 12/04/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201883461] | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20201927621] -Request to reschedule Oral Argument until sometime after November 16th is GRANTED. Exact time and date to be determined. | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20201992701] -Request to extend the time within which briefs are due on the pending matters is DENIED. | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
October 30, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO INTERVENE
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
October 30, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC *LINKED FILING* | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/21/2020 will be decided on 10/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201883461] | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION TO INTERVENE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/14/2020 was rescheduled to 10/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201823460] | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/08/2020 was rescheduled to 10/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201790861] | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/14/2020 will be decided on 10/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201823460] | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RECONSIDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/08/2020 will be decided on 10/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201790861] | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISCOVERY - Granted by Judge re: 5-DAY ORDER [LCV20201727857] | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV20201511104] | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER INTERVENE-Denied by Judge LYNOTT, KEITH, E re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201586437] | |
September 25, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
September 25, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO INTERVENE
Judge: KEITH E LYNOTT |
||
September 25, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RECONSIDER-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201512806] | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RECONSIDER-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201632764] | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201512806] -Please send proof of service for the Motion to Reconsider. | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/16/2020 will be decided on 09/25/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: CROSS MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201632764] | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
September 11, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO QUASH
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/09/2020 will be decided on 09/25/2020. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20201586437] | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE submitted by MALONEY, THOMAS, E of THOMAS E. MALONEY, JR. on behalf of BERMAN ROSENBACH, P.C. against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 09/02/2020 re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20201301706] | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
August 28, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO QUASH
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/27/2020 will be decided on 09/25/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20201512806] | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/26/2020 will be decided on 09/11/2020. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20201501533] | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RECONSIDER submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/27/2020 will be decided on 09/25/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV20201511104] | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/27/2020 was rescheduled to 09/11/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20201301706] | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MEISTER PETER H | |
August 07, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO PAY COUNSEL FEES
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PAY COUNSEL FEES-Denied by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION TO PAY COUNSEL FEES [LCV20201249071] | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by DUFFY, JULIA, E of O'TOOLE SCRIVO, LLC on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
July 30, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
July 30, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, MEISTER PETER H, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order To Transfer To Another Court - DENIED by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Granted by Judge VENA, THOMAS, R re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20201113612] | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/24/2020 was rescheduled to 07/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20201113612] | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/27/2020 was rescheduled to 08/28/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20201301706] | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/03/2020 was rescheduled to 07/30/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV2020989013] | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/27/2020 will be decided on 08/28/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO QUASH [LCV20201301706] | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of MEISTER PETER H against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH submitted by FRAZZA, PETER, J of GIBBONS PC on behalf of PETER H MEISTER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
July 24, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
July 24, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by FREEMAN, DAVID, MARC of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PAY COUNSEL FEES submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/20/2020 will be decided on 08/07/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO PAY COUNSEL FEES [LCV20201249071] | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
July 10, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
July 10, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: THOMAS R VENA |
||
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/03/2020 was rescheduled to 07/24/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV2020989013] | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/24/2020 was rescheduled to 07/24/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20201113612] | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE, JEFFREY H SCHECHTER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/24/2020 will be decided on 07/10/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20201113612] | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/24/2020 was rescheduled to 07/10/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20201113612] | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER *LINKED FILING* | |
June 19, 2020 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: THOMAS M MOORE |
||
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., JEFFREY H SCHECHTER | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/03/2020 was rescheduled to 07/10/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV2020989013] | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20201062588] -Judge Vena has granted your request to file a sur reply. If you have any questions, please contact me at james.sanchez1@njcourts.gov. Thank you. | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SCHECHTER, JEFFREY, H of COLE SCHOTZ PC on behalf of JEFFREY H SCHECHTER against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A., MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/03/2020 was rescheduled to 06/19/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV2020989013] | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. *LINKED FILING* | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by SCRIVO, THOMAS, P of O'TOOLE SCRIVO, LLC on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by MAZIE, DAVID, A of MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN on behalf of MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE against KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/03/2020 will be decided on 06/19/2020. Oral argument has been requested. You will be notified when oral argument is scheduled. Do not come to the courthouse unless you are so notified. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV2020989013] | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE *LINKED FILING* | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE, H of NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against MAZIE SLATER KATZ FREEMAN LLC, DAVID MAZIE | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ESX-L-003110-20 submitted by NAGEL, BRUCE H, NAGEL RICE LLP on behalf of KIRSH, GELBAND & STONE, P.A. against DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN |