Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Christina E Marcelino-Estevez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Angelo Jamie Vasquez, against 1-100 Abc Corp., 1-100 Jane Doe, Ricardo D Maldonado, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ, . Essex County, NJ Superior Courts with VENABLE, SHEILA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Another County |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | This case has been transferred from ESX-L-565-23 to PAS-L-572-23 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by NATIELLO, MICHAEL of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of CHRISTINA E MARCELINO-ESTEVEZ against RICARDO D MALDONADO, JOHN DOE 1-100, JANE DOE 1-100, ABC CORP. 1-100 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE-Granted by Judge VENABLE, SHEILA, A re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV2023397909] | |
February 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE
Judge: SHEILA A VENABLE |
||
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by VASQUEZ, ANGELO, JAMIE of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of CHRISTINA E MARCELINO-ESTEVEZ against RICARDO D MALDONADO, JOHN DOE 1-100, JANE DOE 1-100, ABC CORP. 1-100 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/30/2023 will be decided on 02/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE [LCV2023397909] | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER VENUE submitted by NATIELLO, MICHAEL of JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of CHRISTINA E MARCELINO-ESTEVEZ against RICARDO D MALDONADO, JOHN DOE 1-100, JANE DOE 1-100, ABC CORP. 1-100 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV2023342224] -Case must be filed in Passaic County unless otherwise noted in Complaint to show that it belongs in Essex County. | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for ESX-L-000565-23 submitted by VASQUEZ, ANGELO JAMIE, JAMES VASQUEZ, PC on behalf of CHRISTINA E MARCELINO-ESTEVEZ against RICARDO D MALDONADO, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, ABC CORP. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.