Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
New Community Commons, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeffrey R Kuschner, against Otis Gammage, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ, . Essex County, NJ Superior Courts with Francine A. Schott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2016 |
CategoryContract Dispute |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEssex County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 19, 2016Summons UnServed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 11, 2017Signed Order submitted by Court
Date: February 07, 2017Case Dism by Rule Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 11, 2017Return Service - Unserved submitted by Staff
Date: January 18, 2017Return Service - Served submitted by Staff
Date: January 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Signed Order submitted by Court | |
February 03, 2017 |
MOTION HEARING
Judge: FRANCINE J SCHOTT |
||
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Service - Unserved submitted by Staff | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons UnServed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dism by Rule Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion To Enter Default Judgment (Out Of Time) submitted by J. KUSCHNER of JEFFREY R. KUSCHNER on behalf of NEW COMMUNITY COMMONS against OTIS GAMMAGE | |
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Service - Served submitted by Staff | |
November 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | A Complaint for ESX-DC-015599-16 submitted by KUSCHNER, JEFFREY R, JEFFREY R. KUSCHNER on behalf of NEW COMMUNITY COMMONS against OTIS GAMMAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.